ENGLISH CERAMIC CIRCLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
lecture programme exhibitions publish research seminars visits to museums & collections
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francesca Rose Boyd | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Ann Lead | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jane Walker | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Spier | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Helen Jotham | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amber Turner | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Robert Nicholas Peake | Trustee | 27 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Smith | Trustee | 20 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Caroline McCafffrey-Howarth | Trustee | 19 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY PEMBERTON | Trustee | 30 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
JACQUI PEARCE | Trustee |
|
||||||
JONATHAN DAVID COOPER GRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.24k | £25.33k | £34.19k | £34.91k | £36.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.36k | £28.26k | £33.56k | £28.58k | £32.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 27 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 27 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED 15 MARCH 2003. AS AMENDED ON 19 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
A1. TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF CERAMICS AND ENAMELS MANUFACTURED, DECORATED, OR USED IN THE BRITISH ISLES. 2. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH AND STUDY IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO CERAMICS AND ENAMELS MANUFACTURED, DECORATED, OR USED IN THE BRITISH ISLES AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL KNOWLEDGE GAINED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
English Ceramic Circle
BM Box 7246
London
WC1N 3XX
- Phone:
- 01296770362
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window