DE MERC CHAMBER CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a small amateur adult choir specialising in the performance of exciting and unusual unaccompanied choral music. We have a very broad, innovative and mainly secular repertoire which is challenging and interesting to both singers and audience alike. We are equally at home singing classical music in a tiny village church or light jazz in a concert hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 14 January 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIAN MAXWELL SEYMOUR ROQUES | Chair | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Colin Bromage | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH O'DWYER | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
GAYNOR MARY TREGIDGO | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MR P M KINCEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.40k | £3.23k | £5.10k | £4.96k | £5.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.84k | £2.93k | £4.22k | £4.93k | £5.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 AUGUST 2002 AS AMENDED 17 SEPTEMBER 2006. as amended on 15 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE; TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 High Road
BROXBOURNE
Hertfordshire
EN10 7ND
- Phone:
- 07546 996442
- Email:
- info@demerc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window