Financial history SPEAKEASY ADVOCACY

Charity number: 1108304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £285.52k £49.71k £100.49k £123.41k £185.27k
Total expenditure £284.53k £114.64k £122.35k £136.61k £140.88k
Income from government contracts £51.80k £29.30k £23.52k £25.15k £28.89k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £24.91k £57.75k £103.81k