TRINITY LINKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School fundraising
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Dorset
Governance
- 24 June 2003: Standard registration
- 09 January 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 05 March 2012: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kristy Jayne Scott | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.10k | £3.87k | £2.73k | £3.26k | £4.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.02k | £1.35k | £14.01k | £290 | £1.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 July 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 September 2020 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 12 MARCH 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 10 DECEMBER 2002 AND 22 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVE OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE WELL-BEING OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL; AND 2.2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL, (WHICH ARE NOT PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE TRINITY CE VA FIRST SCHOOL, VERWOOD IN THE COUNTY OF DORSET.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trinity C of E V A First School
Coopers Lane
Verwood
BH31 7PG
- Phone:
- 01202 821704
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window