Accounts and annual returns SOCIETY OF AMIGOS DE IRACAMBI

Charity number: 1097474
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 30 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 30 May 2012 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 23 March 2011 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 15 March 2010 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required