Accounts and annual returns ALL SAINTS FIRST SCHOOL PTFA

Charity Number: 1095264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 02 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 02 December 2024 301 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 03 May 2023 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 22 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required