GREENFIELD LOWER SCHOOL PARENT / STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School fundraising such as fetes, dinners and quiz nights
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 20 March 2003: Standard registration
- 09 October 2024: Funds received from 1091439 FRIENDS OF PULLOXHILL SCHOOL
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Lorraine Inglis | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally-Ann Butterworth | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNA LOUISE MASTERS | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Wendy Jean Brown | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.11k | £7.78k | £4.84k | £4.28k | £4.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.23k | £1.62k | £3.13k | £2.63k | £3.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 July 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 September 2021 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED 6 FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS 2. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL."
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREENFIELD LOWER SCHOOL
PULLOXHILL ROAD
GREENFIELD
BEDFORD
MK45 5ES
- Phone:
- 01525712426
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window