Trustees LANGTON GREEN COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL P.T.A.

Charity Number: 1095127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Jane Edleston Trustee 20 March 2025
None on record
Leila Eldred Trustee 06 November 2024
None on record
Thomas Edward Harding Churton Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Pamela Jane Gibbs Trustee 19 October 2020
None on record
Alexander Cornelius Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record