Trustees FRIENDS OF GREENTREES SCHOOL
Charity number: 1096506

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Solafa Diab | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Veta Annie Charman | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Victoria Watts | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Williams | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carrie-Anne MacDonald | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica White | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jane Douce | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Howes | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Praulins | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Ashton | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Crowle | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Elliott | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Georgette Cecily den Breejen | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Jane Winmill | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Louise Garrett | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helena Alexa Anne Bradley | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Tony Geary | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE EYERS | Trustee | 27 May 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.