Financial history COMMUNITY, EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1094421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £64.16k £109.38k £67.63k £75.41k £93.09k
Total expenditure £133.24k £80.24k £84.41k £85.40k £93.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A