CARITAS SOCIAL ACTION

Charity number: 1101431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Caritas Social Action Network (CSAN) is the official domestic social action agency of the Catholic Bishops' Conference of England and Wales and a member of Caritas Internationalis. We support our family of charities and dioceses and seek to strengthen and facilitate Catholic charitable activities, and to bring the voices of the poor and Catholic teaching to bear in guiding public policy.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £444,000
Total expenditure: £414,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 January 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CATHOLIC SOCIAL ACTION IN ENGLAND AND WALES (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir John Battle Trustee 07 December 2023
BARCA - LEEDS
Received: On time
NEW WORTLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
JOSEPH ASPDIN SKILLS TRUST
Received: On time
Rt Rev Paul Hendricks Trustee 07 December 2023
BUTLER TRUST
Received: On time
WOODROFFE BEQUEST ADMINISTERED BY (THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK)
Received: On time
REDMOND'S CHARITY
Received: On time
WHITTINGHAM BEQUEST
Received: On time
WEDGEWOOD ENDOWMENT ADMINISTERED BY (THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK)
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
WILLIAMS SOUTHWARK FUND
Received: On time
THE CATHOLIC ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
SOUTHWARK TAYLOR EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
DUKE OF NORFOLK TRUST
Received: On time
CANON TIERNEY TRUST
Received: On time
HONORA TURNER O'CALLAGHAN SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
HOWARD OF GLOSSOP BEQUEST
Received: On time
ROBINSON BEQUEST
Received: On time
THE ALLENBY ENDOWMENT IN CONNECTION WITH CRAYFORD R C SCHOOL
Received: On time
MRS C J I B GORDON-CANNING'S PRIESTS' TRUST (LONDON)
Received: On time
DUFFY BEQUEST
Received: On time
THE INCORPORATED CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY
Received: On time
DE SAMPAYO BEQUEST
Received: On time
DEPTFORD POOR FUND
Received: On time
THE BLUNDELL CHARITABLE FUND
Received: On time
CHARITY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION IN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESES OF SOUTHWARK AND ARUNDEL AND BRIGHTON
Received: On time
Lisa Lilley Trustee 07 December 2023
None on record
Julia Kathryn Nicola Corcoran Trustee 12 January 2023
None on record
Dr Johan Nicholas Benedict Bergstrom Allen Trustee 12 January 2023
None on record
Daphne Amevenu Trustee 12 January 2023
None on record
Jonathan Michael Heard Trustee 12 January 2023
None on record
Maria Blazquez Trustee 03 September 2019
None on record
Nicola Frances Thomas Trustee 03 September 2019
THAMESMEAD CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY LIMITED
Received: On time
TOGETHER SOUTHWARK
Received: On time
Richard Peter Harries Trustee 03 September 2019
ST ELIZABETH'S CENTRE
Received: On time
ST JOSEPH'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £380.88k £405.79k £286.91k £403.71k £444.00k
Total expenditure £392.99k £334.47k £295.40k £387.39k £414.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 05 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CARITAS SOCIAL ACTION NETWORK
Romero House
55 Westminster Bridge Road
LONDON
SE1 7JB
Phone:
02078702210