ASYLUM SUPPORT & IMMIGRATION RESOURCE TEAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide relief for asylum-seekers, refugees, undocumented migrants and their dependants in Birmingham and the West Midlands who are in condition of need, hardship and distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Sandwell
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 14 July 2003: Standard registration
- 09 February 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 09 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1159888 ASYLUM SUPPORT AND IMMIGRATION RESOURCE TEAM
- ASIRT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.67k | £58.18k | £0 | £0 | £21.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.11k | £53.15k | £0 | £34.24k | £21.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 28 June 2019 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED ON 20 JUNE 2003.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR ASYLUM SEEKERS, REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN THE BIRMINGHAM AREA, WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS. 2. TO PROVIDE GENERAL LEGAL ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS WHO ARE SUBJECT TO U.K. IMMIGRATION CONTROL AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR INADEQUATE MEANS ARE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE FROM THEIR OWN RESOURCES. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF LOCAL PEOPLE AND THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN ORDER TO ASSIST THEIR INCLUSION INTO WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window