Accounts and annual returns SOUTHAMPTON COMPLEMENTARY MEDICAL RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 1094802
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 16 November 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 01 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required