UK PARURESIS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 July 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 December 2002: Standard registration
- 16 May 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 16 May 2006: Funds transferred to 1109541 UK PARURESIS TRUST
- UKPA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/07/2004 | 19/07/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.53k | £8.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.13k | £6.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 July 2005 | 13 February 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 July 2004 | 28 September 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JULY 2002
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM THE PHOBIA AVOIDANT PARURESIS (AKA SHY BLADDER SYNDROME), PARTICULARLY BY: A) THE PROVISION OF INTERNET BASED INFORMATION AND SUPPORT. B) THE PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF LOCAL SUPPORT GROUPS. C) THE PROVISION OF PHOBIA DESENSITISATION WORKSHOPS. D) THE PROMOTION OF THE CONCEPT OF INDIVIDUAL PRIVACY IN THE DESIGN OF PUBLIC TOILETS. E) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE CONDITION, PARTICULARLY ITS CAUSE AND TREATMENT. F) THE RAISING OF PUBLIC AWARENESS, INCLUDING THAT OF THE MEDICAL PROFESSION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window