Financial history COLWYN GATEWAY CLUB

Charity Number: 1098141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.41k £5.26k £5.65k £5.30k £12.90k
Total expenditure £8.65k £648 £8.92k £5.60k £13.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A