THE CHICHESTER SHIP CANAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the Trust is to preserve and maintain an attractive and accessible canal, safeguarding the unique heritage and natural habitat, for present and future generations to enjoy. We focus on 4 benefits that an active and regenerating waterway brings: economic and cultural contribution, physical and mental health, social cohesion and civic pride, environment and heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £256 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
170 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 02 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Jane Weston | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Carberry Hunter | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Michael John Lambert | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Sarah Cox | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Stoneham | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.39k | £68.21k | £131.66k | £130.26k | £82.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.99k | £45.16k | £33.05k | £147.32k | £48.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.00k | N/A | £10.00k | £256 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF CANALS, NAVIGABLE RIVERS AND INLAND WATERWAYS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR THE NAVIGATION BETWEEN CHICHESTER AND THE HARBOUR, THE CHICHESTER SHIP CANAL AND THE PORTSMOUTH AND ARUNDEL CANAL.
Area of benefit
WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chichester Ship Canal Trust
Canal Wharf
Stockbridge Road
CHICHESTER
West Sussex
PO19 8DT
- Phone:
- 01243771363
- Email:
- info@chichestercanal.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window