ELTHAM PARK BAPTIST CHURCH PLAYWELL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Playwell's aim is to advance the education of children below compulsory school age in a safe environment. Having 3 different size halls and a secure outside area allows a wide range of activities from free play to painting to reading. A computer is allowing children to develop basic skills. Fitness and artistic expression allow the children to develop.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £6,688 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Greenwich
Governance
- 01 May 2003: Standard registration
- PLAYWELL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Goldsworthy | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|||||
ruth jennifer sathri | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY RICKARD | Trustee | 31 January 2009 |
|
|
||||
LINDA ANN BARNES | Trustee | 31 January 2008 |
|
|
||||
JULIE GRAHAM | Trustee | 01 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
COLIN JOHN BARNES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CASTLING GEORGE FARRAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.63k | £150.44k | £181.98k | £139.81k | £152.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.31k | £127.24k | £157.42k | £150.25k | £159.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £165.24k | £6.80k | £6.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT) OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE, AND B) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION FOR SUCH CHILDREN IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE BY: PROVIDING FOR ANY CHILDREN WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION BY REASON OF THE CHILD'S RELIGIOUS PERSUASION, RACIAL ORIGIN, CULTURAL OR LINGUISTIC BACKGROUND A SAFE AND SATISFYING PRE-SCHOOL IN A CHRISTIAN ENVIRONMENT. THE INCOME AND (AT THE DISCRETION OF THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE) THE CAPITAL OF THE PRE-SCHOOL SHALL BE APPLIED SOLELY IN FURTHERING THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ELTHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
ELTHAM PARK BAPTIST CHURCH
32A WESTMOUNT ROAD
LONDON
SE9 1JE
- Phone:
- 07763 887181
- Email:
- info@epbc.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window