Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF KORAT GAG

Charity number: 1095072
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 16 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2014 30 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 12 November 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2012 09 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 10 July 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2011 30 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 30 July 2012 On Time