SOUTH LONDON SOMALI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information, Advice and Guidance - Housing, Social, Debt, Immigration, Education and Employement Youth Diversionary activities - Football sports club, cultural songs and dances Family and Parental Workshops - Bi - monthly services Old Persons Program - Coffee mornings Community Projects - Local Drug KHAT services, Citizenship training and exams. Translations and Interpretation, Cultural class
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2015
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Croydon
- Lambeth
- Merton
- Sutton
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 28 May 2003: Standard registration
- SOSOCOM (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARITY CHAIRMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BOARD MEMBER AND TREASURER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BOARD MEMBER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARITY COORDINATOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.21k | £5.76k | £6.16k | £7.00k | £13.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.79k | £6.69k | £6.36k | £6.83k | £13.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1064 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1064 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1429 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1429 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1794 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1794 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
A. FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF SOMALIS AND OTHERS RESIDENT OR INTENDING TO RESIDE IN SOUTH LONDON BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH ADVICE, ASSISTANCE, REPRESENTATION, COUNSELLING, TRANSLATING AND INTERPRETATION SERVICES IN MATTERS SUCH AS MONEY, DEBTS, WELFARE BENEFITS, HOUSING, HEALTH, ASYLUM, IMMIGRATION, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT. B. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTH LONDON AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THOSE INHABITANTS WHO ARE SOMALIS OR OF SOMALI DESCENT BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
SOUTH LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 UPPER GREEN WEST
MITCHAM
SURREY
CR4 3AA
- Phone:
- 02086406661
- Email:
- amusse@sosocom.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window