SHAREAFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist fellow Christians and others living in impoverished communities in Sub Saharan Africa by providing facilities, funds and services through SHARE's in-country organisations. The primary aim is to support initiatives that will reduce poverty through sustained economic growth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Malawi
- Zambia
Governance
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES WINSTON MCPHAIL | Chair |
|
||||||
Philip Cherrie | Trustee | 29 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edward James Morrow | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Stanley Rogers | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
LEONARD DAVID CURRIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £286.64k | £415.27k | £464.52k | £450.69k | £349.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £317.13k | £382.01k | £385.37k | £526.99k | £302.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO SUPPORT CHRISTIANS LIVING IN IMPOVERISHED COMMUNITIES IN AFRICA BY CHANNELLING GOODS, FUNDS AND SERVICES THROUGH SHARE'S APPROVED NETWORK OF CHRISTIAN ASSEMBLIES AND MISSIONS. THE PRIMARY FOCUS IS TO BELIEVERS, WHILE ENDEAVOURING TO ASSIST OTHER COMMUNITY MEMBERS ("THE OBJECTS") AT THE DISCRETION OF SHARE.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Olave House
All Saints Road
Creeting St. Mary
IPSWICH
IP6 8NQ
- Phone:
- 01229825939
- Email:
- info@shareafrica.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window