ACTIVE LIFE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide or assist in the provision of facilities and services for recreation and other leisure time occupation primarily in the district of Canterbury in the interests of social welfare, such facilities being provided to the public at large.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income:
£3,789,821
Donations and legacies | £42.02k | |
Charitable activities | £3.74m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £4.05k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,026,518
Raising funds | £34.65k | |
Charitable activities | £3.99m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,743,752 from 1 government contract(s) and £42,019 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £34.65k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.99m |
People

250 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 03 January 2003: Standard registration
- ACTIVE LIFE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Salisbury | Trustee | 12 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROSALIND BARLEY | Trustee | 08 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JAMES THOMAS | Trustee | 07 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Longmire | Trustee | 31 October 2012 |
|
|||||
GERALD STANLEY KNOX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON PAUL JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.17m | £5.02m | £3.36m | £3.56m | £3.79m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.50m | £3.04m | £3.75m | £3.54m | £4.03m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.17m | £155.92k | £156.00k | £156.00k | £3.74m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.31m | £1.18m | £42.02k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £1.31m | £1.38m | £42.02k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.17m | £5.02m | £2.06m | £2.18m | £3.74m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £3.79k | £1.25k | £934 | £4.05k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.50m | £3.04m | £3.75m | £3.54m | £3.99m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £34.65k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £8.61k | £9.00k | £5.19k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £512.67k | £355.27k | £403.76k | £261.60k | £181.63k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.36m | £872.58k | £646.86k | £1.62m | £606.98k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.08m | £474.32k | £680.20k | £1.70m | £847.93k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2024 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 March 2024 | 139 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 January 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 January 2021 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 19 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 FEBRUARY 2002 AS FURTHER AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 MARCH 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION PRIMARILY IN THE DISTRICT OF CANTERBURY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, SUCH FACILITIES BEING PROVIDED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE SAVE THAT SPECIAL FACILITIES MAY BE PROVIDED FOR PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY MAY HAVE NEED OF SPECIAL FACILITIES AND/OR; TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PRIMARILY IN THE DISTRICT OF CANTERBURY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY DRAMATIC EDUCATION AND FOSTER THE PUBLIC INTEREST IN ARTS.
Area of benefit
CANTERBURY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 3 & 4 Blake House
Schooner Court
Crossways Business Park
Dartford
DA2 6QQ
- Phone:
- 020 7740 7500
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window