ST. CATHERINE'S VILLAGE HALL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintains and offers for hire to the community, a hall in the St Catherines Village area of Guildford, Surrey
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 19 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jane Fielding | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Greenberg | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Jane Webster | Trustee | 08 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT DRAKE | Trustee | 16 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Charles Garcka | Trustee | 09 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Eric Hewitt Thorniley | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROSAMUND CHARLOTTE CALOW | Trustee | 07 December 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.78k | £10.93k | £30.06k | £17.06k | £23.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.24k | £10.55k | £22.04k | £13.48k | £26.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.85k | £24.07k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT IS TO PROVIDE A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF ST CATHERINE'S, GUILDFORD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
INHABITANTS OF ST CATHERINE'S GUILDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Catherines Village Hall
Chestnut Avenue
GUILDFORD
GU2 4HF
- Phone:
- 01483504485
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window