ENGLAND RUGBY FOOTBALL SCHOOLS' UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Administer, foster, encourage, extend and control the game of Rugby Union Football for the moral, mental and physical development of schoolboys and schoolgirls attending schools within England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 February 2003: Standard registration
- ERFSU (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH GEE | Chair | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK URQUHART BATCHELOR | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ARTHUR GEORGE WINTER | Trustee | 06 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR MARK LOWE | Trustee |
|
||||||
NIGEL ROBERT ORTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.32k | £3.79k | £11.63k | £28.15k | £29.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.65k | £14.79k | £53.67k | £56.28k | £43.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 June 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 07 June 2024 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 June 2023 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 June 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 July 2021 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2020
(These accounts |
26 July 2021 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12TH SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADMINISTER, FOSTER, ENCOURAGE, EXTEND AND CONTROL RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL FOR THE MORAL, MENTAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT OF SCHOOL BOYS AND SCHOOL GIRLS ATTENDING SCHOOLS WITHIN ENGLAND WHICH EXPRESSION WHEN USED HEREAFTER SHALL INCLUDE THE CHANNEL ISLANDS AND THE ISLE OF MAN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE CHANNEL ISLANDS AND THE ISLE OF MAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
England Rugby Schools
c/o Rugby Football Union
200 Whitton Road
Twickenham
TW2 7BA
- Phone:
- 0871 222 2120
- Email:
- erfsu@dhwt.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window