Trustees ACORN COMMUNITY CARE
Charity number: 1095207

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hassan Nait Ouaarab | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Vary | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Holliday | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Harrison | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Storr | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
TOBY BARTHOLOMEW BELL | Trustee | 10 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN NEAL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.