Headway Kent

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Headway Kent provides activities for adults, with Acquired Brain Injuries(ABI)their families/carers. We provide person centred social rehabilitation in the community, to assist with an individuals recovery journey- including mentally, physically, educationally and economically whilst reducing social isolation and loneliness that can occur following an ABI. We offer four Community Hubs across Kent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £159,781 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 14 April 2004: Standard registration
- 30 October 2023: Funds received from 1122466 EAST KENT STROKES
- HEADWAY (Working name)
- HEADWAY EAST KENT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Wilkins | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian MacDowall | Trustee | 23 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Parker | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE FLINT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £384.39k | £366.54k | £383.26k | £335.39k | £259.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £405.38k | £372.91k | £429.47k | £380.27k | £389.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £231.64k | N/A | £272.70k | £239.81k | £159.78k | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | N/A | £19.85k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 December 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
10 December 2021 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 MARCH 2004 as amended on 22 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM HEAD INJURIES IN EAST KENT BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) TO PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING OF ALL ASPECTS OF HEAD INJURY (AND SOME FORMS OF ACQUIRED BRAIN INJURY). AND TO PROVIDE INFORMATION, SUPPORT, AND SERVICES TO PEOPLE WITH HEAD INJURIES, THEIR FAMILIES, AND CARERS RESIDING IN EAST KENT ("THE AREA OF COVER") (B) TO PROMOTE A COORDINATED, MULTI-DISCIPLINED APPROACH TO HEAD INJURY SCREENING, ACUTE CARE, ASSESSMENT, REHABILITATION, AND COMMUNITY RE-ENTRY. (C) TO ASSIST PEOPLE WITH HEAD INJURY TO RETURN TO COMMUNITY LIVING, INCLUDING ACCESS TO APPROPRIATE ACCOMMODATION, EMPLOYMENT, SOCIAL OUTLETS, AND MEANINGFUL ACTIVITY; THEREBY ASSISTING THOSE WITH HEAD INJURY WITH REINTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY, REGAINING INDEPENDENCE, AND ACHIEVING THEIR HIGHEST LEVEL OF QUALITY OF LIFE. (D) THROUGH SUPPORT, ADVOCACY, AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES; TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR SHARING EXPERIENCES. (E) TO RAISE AWARENESS OF THE EFFECTS OF HEAD INJURY AND REPRESENT THE INTERESTS OF THOSE WITH HEAD INJURY WITH THE STATUTORY SERVICES AS WELL AS OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND TO LOBBY FOR IMPROVED, SPECIALISED SERVICES LOCALLY. (F) THROUGH PUBLICITY, TRAINING CONFERENCES, AND MEETING; TO EDUCATE AND INCREASE PUBLIC AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF HEAD INJURY. (G) TO PARTICIPATE IN HEALTH EDUCATION/HEALTH PROMOTION ACTIVITIES THAT WILL REDUCE THE INCIDENCE AND SEVERITY OF HEAD INJURY. (F) AT ALL TIMES HEADWAY EAST KENT LIMITED ENDEAVOURS TO WORK IN PARTNERSHIP WITH LIKE-MINDED ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY BODIES AND TO PROVIDE MEETINGS, LECTURES, AND FORUMS TO DISCUSS AND PURSUE THE OBJECTIVES.
Area of benefit
EAST KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEADWAY KENT
HEADWAY HOUSE
KENT AND CANTERBURY HOSPITAL
ETHELBERT ROAD
CANTERBURY
KENT
- Phone:
- 01227783002
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window