Governing document EACH - EDUCATIONAL ACTION CHALLENGING HOMOPHOBIA
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/05/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/04/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/06/2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF DISCRIMINATION EXPERIENCED BY REASON OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTITY TO: A) AMELIORATE THE EFFECTS OF SUCH DISCRIMINATION ON LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER (LGBT) PEOPLE B) PROMOTE AFFIRMATIVE AND ACCURATE REPRESENTATIONS OF LGBT LIVES C) INSPIRE BEST PRACTICE IN CREATING A SAFER AND MORE EQUAL ENVIRONMENT FOR ALL USING ALL AVAILABLE METHODS SUCH AS ARE CHARITABLE AT LAW.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE ENGLAND AND WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.