HOLBECK CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worship and Christian outreach into the local community and financial support to local and international charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Leeds City
Governance
- 18 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEAN ELIZABETH BIRCH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Patricia Tate | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ISABELLE HEBDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENISE SENIOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR KEN TIDSWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAYMOND BRIAN HAWKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM JOHN BIRCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.65k | £8.45k | £6.49k | £6.34k | £5.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.65k | £7.61k | £6.70k | £6.49k | £6.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 12 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED 24 NOVEMBER 2002 AND 13TH OF JULY 2003.
Charitable objects
A) "THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN AND AROUND SOUTH LEEDS AND; B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, CLOTHING AND OTHER GOODS TO SUCH PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES."
Area of benefit
SOUTH LEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 OAKHURST GROVE
LEEDS
LS11 7AG
- Phone:
- 01132713795
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window