Financial history T & S TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1095939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £86.22k £123.02k £139.04k £209.47k £306.89k
Total expenditure £144.11k £95.22k £117.60k £216.16k £217.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k N/A N/A