T & S TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To pursue the objects of the charity with all the resources available to the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gateshead
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 13 February 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vivienne Ethel Salomon | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aharon SANDLER | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHOSHANNA SANDLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.22k | £123.02k | £139.04k | £209.47k | £306.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.11k | £95.22k | £117.60k | £216.16k | £217.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 26 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 26 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED ON 2 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
(I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ACCORDING TO THE TENETS OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION (III) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE ELDERLY OR PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS IN THE JEWISH COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 WHITEHALL ROAD
GATESHEAD
NE8 4ET
- Phone:
- 01914825050
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window