Accounts and annual returns SAVE THE WORLD CLUB

Charity number: 1096271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 03 April 2024 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 07 November 2024 276 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 04 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 04 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 19 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 March 2021 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required