Accounts and annual returns HERTS MOTOR PROJECT LIMITED

Charity Number: 1099183
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2006 18 June 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 18 June 2007 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2005 17 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 17 February 2006 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2004 22 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 22 January 2005 On Time