FRIENDS OF BRAILSFORD SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
raise funds to provide equipment and resources for Brailsford Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 20 January 2003: Standard registration
- 07 June 2024: Funds received from 1141866 BRAILSFORD PRE-SCHOOL
- FBS (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kelly Leanne Brayshaw | Chair | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jane Walker-Foss | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth Robinson | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Dawn Hill | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Mary Beale | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Albon | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.35k | £4.73k | £1.62k | £207 | £2.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.49k | £7.23k | £110 | £2.12k | £1.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 July 2023 | 383 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 July 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 November 2020 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BRAILSFORD CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bella Vista
Brailsford
Ashbourne
DE6 3BG
- Phone:
- 07706054033
- Email:
- preecey1@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window