Financial history WOODLANDS CHRISTIAN REVIVAL CENTRE

Charity Number: 1096069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £792 £385 £5.98k £5.28k £10.79k
Total expenditure £2.50k £1.65k £3.32k £5.30k £11.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A