THE AUSTIN BURKE COMMUNITY SERVICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The loan referred to in the 2007 Return was returned to the bank because of the abandonment of the project. This Charity, however, will continue to work in partnership with other Community groups to realise projects we have outlined in our Constitution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 15 January 2004: Standard registration
- 08 October 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.02k | £166.39k | £159.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.85k | £12.32k | £158.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 19 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 19 June 2008 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 29 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 29 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED 21 DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THOSE PEOPLE WHO HAVE BEEN EXCLUDED OR ARE AT RISK OF BEING EXCLUDED FROM MAINSTREAM EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND VOCATIONAL COURSES. (II) THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC WHO BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE. (III) THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY BY THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES, TRAINING AND ADVICE. (IV) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTH RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING VOLLEYBALL, BASKETBALL, BADMINTON AND KICKBOXING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE LEEDS, WEST YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window