DUNKIRK FUN CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dunkirk Fun Club provides high quality childcare and workshop activities within a safe and secure school environment for children aged 3-11 years. The club has a wide range of indoor and outdoor resources enabling every child to develop essential skills and meet new friends. The club runs breakfast, after school and holiday provision from 8am-6pm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 September 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 08 April 2003: Standard registration
- 02 July 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 02 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1200188 DUNKIRK FUN CLUB
- DUNKIRK COMMUNITY OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS CARE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 03/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.34k | £61.38k | £65.19k | £29.29k | £66.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.85k | £47.61k | £80.44k | £27.69k | £70.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 03 September 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 September 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JANUARY 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window