Accounts and annual returns SNIPES SHORT MAT BOWLS CLUB

Charity number: 1099012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 April 2024 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required