Financial history INTERCLIMATE TRUST

Charity number: 1100981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £46.92k £51.10k £85.60k £46.18k £79.80k
Total expenditure £41.06k £57.94k £67.40k £63.93k £83.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £21.21k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £7.36k £10.88k N/A