INTERCLIMATE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing Global Citizenship Awareness
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £21,205 from 4 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 December 2003: Standard registration
- GLOBAL DIMENSION TRUST (Previous name)
- INTERCLIMATE TUSTR (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruben James Brooke | Chair | 28 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anish Saigal | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Mason | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julian Michael Parkin | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Auden Caroll | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tara Ganga Theiss | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Fiona Sayers | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ERNEST MATTHEW STREETER | Trustee | 29 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.92k | £51.10k | £85.60k | £46.18k | £79.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.06k | £57.94k | £67.40k | £63.93k | £83.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £21.21k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £7.36k | £10.88k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 JULY 2003.
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, SCHOOLCHILDREN AND STUDENTS IN TERTIARY EDUCATION, OF THE SOCIAL ECONOMIC, ENVIRONMENTAL AND OTHER CHARACTERISTICS AND CONCERNS OF DEVELOPING COUNTRIES AND THEIR RELATIONSHIPS WITH OTHER COUNTRIES; (2) TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, SCHOOLCHILDREN AND STUDENTS IN TERTIARY EDUCATION, IN SUBJECTS CONCERNED WITH HUNGER, DISEASE, POVERTY, AND IGNORANCE AND THE SOLUTIONS THEREOF; (3) TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PEOPLE OF DIFFERENT NATIONAL, RACIAL AND ETHNIC ORIGINS AND RELIGIOUS BELIEFS; (4) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROTECT AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AND PROTECT, ENHANCE AND RESTORE THE NATURAL AND PHYSICAL ENVIRONMENT THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND PARTICULARLY IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Rodic Davidson Architects
1 Pied Bull Yard
LONDON
WC1A 2AE
- Phone:
- 02089936683
- Email:
- info@interclimate.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window