Accounts and annual returns PENNINE PENN ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity number: 1099274
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 May 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 03 May 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 January 2017 On Time