Financial history PENNINE PENN ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity number: 1099274
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £102.25k £117.86k £196.20k £218.59k £319.16k
Total expenditure £108.20k £117.57k £194.03k £175.66k £310.46k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A