LONDON MANDARIN SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Courses provided: Pre-school classes; 7 Standard Level of Chinese courses for all school age students 4.5-18 Yrs; GCSE and A-level Chinese courses; Chinese Class for adults; Courses on Chinese art and culture, including Chinese Martial Arts, Dancing and Drawing Art.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
68 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 02 April 2003: Standard registration
- 09 February 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 19 March 2012: Re-registered
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
XIU QIN LIAO | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Caiyu Wang | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
YAN CHANG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.01k | £119.26k | £117.79k | £160.59k | £183.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.97k | £166.87k | £121.31k | £164.22k | £195.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED 9 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THOSE RESIDENTS OR WORKING IN LONDON AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE OF CHINESE ETHNIC ORIGIN WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINIONS BY:- 1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CHINESE LANGUAGE AND CULTURE; AND 2) TO PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY AND UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE OF CHINESE ORIGIN AND OTHER COMMUNITIES IN THE UK
Area of benefit
RESIDENTS OR THOSE WORKING IN LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 HYDESIDE GARDENS
LONDON
N9 9RP
- Phone:
- 07939723133
- Email:
- xiuqin888@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.