SOUND CONNECTIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sound Connections develops, supports & empowers young Londoners through high quality music-making opportunities. We do this by delivering groundbreaking participatory music projects, providing professional development to music organisations and practitioners, and undertaking high quality action research and advocacy to promote best practice in music education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 February 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Norton York | Chair | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Lorraine Spence-Stimpson | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Florence Mary Schroeder | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Milli-Rose Rubin | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mathilda Taylor | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nanret Senok | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sasha Mattock | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Esther Bokuma Lenda | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Knox | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £380.30k | £536.37k | £638.19k | £354.31k | £379.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £321.11k | £489.40k | £547.10k | £381.15k | £420.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £21.10k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £177.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £10.16k | £44.99k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £526.21k | £593.21k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £484.52k | £542.15k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £4.88k | £4.95k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.63k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/05/2012
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (B) TO FURTHER ANY PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME AS THE COMPANY THINKS FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
RICH MIX CULTURAL FOUNDATION
35-47 BETHNAL GREEN ROAD
LONDON
E1 6LA
- Phone:
- 020 7729 7220
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window