HAWORTH VILLAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote any charitable purpose for the benefit of the inhabitants of Haworth, West Yorkshire and its environs, to maintain and improve public amenities, promote public safety, and provide recreation and leisure facilities in the interests of social welfare. Present project is support to The Friends of Haworth Park, creating a memorial garden within the park.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bradford City
Governance
- 22 July 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Gary Swallow | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Henry William Sargent | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|||||
COUNCILLOR REBECCA POULSEN | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Henry Ward | Trustee | 22 July 2003 |
|
|
||||
SARAH GRANBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DORAN WACLAWIAK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN PALMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENS FRANCIS HISLOP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FREDA CONQUEST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS GILL HILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £961 | £2.16k | £988 | £3.29k | £3.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.58k | £910 | £506 | £2.23k | £1.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 August 2024 | 276 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 June 2021 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HAWORTH AND ITS ENVIRONS (THE AREA OF BENEFIT), TO MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE PUBLIC AMENITIES, PROMOTE PUBLIC SAFETY, AND PROVIDE RECREATION AND LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE
Area of benefit
HAWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 MYTHOLMES TERRACE
HAWORTH
KEIGHLEY
BD22 8HE
- Phone:
- 01535646049
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window