Financial history WINGATES BAND

Charity Number: 1097122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £51.18k £48.57k £16.29k £12.95k £13.44k
Total expenditure £25.06k £20.97k £21.34k £26.05k £11.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £13.71k N/A £435 N/A