THE FRIENDS OF THE GEORGIAN THEATRE ROYAL (RICHMOND, NORTH YORKSHIRE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the benefit of the public, the repair,restoration,preservation and upkeep of the Georgian Theatre Royal Richmond,North Yorkshire, as a building of historic importance. To promote, maintain, improve and advance education, particularly by the improvement and development of public taste and appreciation and understanding of theatre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 28 April 2003: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF THE GEORGIAN THEATRE ROYAL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerald Broadbent | Chair | 18 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr Jane Lindsay McLennan | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Caroline Marguerite Mills | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.15k | £8.42k | £8.24k | £8.46k | £8.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £811 | £19.61k | £11.36k | £7.81k | £9.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 24 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC REPAIR, RESTORATION, PRESERVATION AND UPKEEP OF THE GEORGIAN THEATRE ROYAL, RICHMOND, NORTH YORKSHIRE AS A BUILDING OF HISTORIC IMPORTANCE. TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC TASTE AND APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THEATRE.
Area of benefit
RICHMOND, NORTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
JASMINE HOUSE
7 West Terrace
RICHMOND
DL10 4EQ
- Phone:
- 01748824047
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window