BIBLE EDUCATIONAL SERVICES

Charity Number: 1096157
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We aim to advance the Christian faith by publishing and distributing Bible courses for children and adults, and providing guidance and training to groups which use them. The courses are called Bibletime, Gleaners, and Newlife. We operate in the UK, but the courses are used in many countries around the world, either via the supply of printed copies, or by free download from our website.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019

Total income: £273,596
Total expenditure: £292,600

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 2003: Standard registration
  • 13 October 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 13 October 2021: Funds transferred to 1186004 BIBLE EDUCATIONAL SERVICES
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • POSTAL BIBLE SCHOOL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £178.44k £123.34k £168.05k £180.45k £273.60k
Total expenditure £131.26k £135.24k £166.02k £189.73k £292.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 April 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 May 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 May 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 13 September 2018 On Time