Accounts and annual returns BRIDGING THE GAP SOUTH EAST

Charity number: 1100703
Charity reporting is overdue by 1199 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 469 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 469 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 834 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 834 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1199 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1199 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required