ASHBOURNE CENTRE FOR GESTALT TRAINING PSYCHOTHERAPY AND COUNSELLING SERVICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ashbourne Centre offers a free Gestalt community counselling support and contemporary life skills service to people on a low income in the London Borough of Southwark.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Southwark
Governance
- 03 February 2004: Standard registration
- 09 August 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2008 | 05/04/2009 | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.13k | £39.88k | £29.06k | £29.92k | £27.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.74k | £24.05k | £18.16k | £14.68k | £12.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | 07 August 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 22 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | 12 September 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2011 | 10 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2011 | 14 July 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | 17 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | 20 January 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 JANUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS FORMED ARE TO PROMOTE GOOD MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF GESTALT PSYCHOTHERAPY AND COUNSELLING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window