LITTLE OUSE HEADWATERS PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The LOHP is a voluntary, community project dedicated to the restoration of the important wildlife and landscape of the fens and heaths of the upper Little Ouse Valley. Although biodiversity conservation is at the heart of our work, we aim to achieve this in a way that both engages and benefits the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,626 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
110 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 26 June 2003: Standard registration
- LITTLE OUSE HEADWATERS PROJECT (Working name)
- LITTLE OUSE HEADWATERS CHARITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Robert Robinson | Chair | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Goodall | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Angela Joan Robinson | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Reg Langston | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Shirley Grainger | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Lingwood | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Robert Fuller | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR N CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR R LANGSTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR R HAYWARD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.37k | £101.23k | £40.28k | £104.77k | £51.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.30k | £73.44k | £60.89k | £91.11k | £95.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.70k | £25.17k | £21.92k | £19.25k | £9.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/12/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/12/2014 as amended on 29 Nov 2019 as amended on 01 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE UPPER LITTLE OUSE VALLEY AND ENVIRONS IN THE PARISHES OF REDGRAVE, HINDERCLAY AND THELNETHAM IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK AND THE PARISHES OF SOUTH LOPHAM AND BLO NORTON IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK.
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF REDGRAVE, HINDERCLAY AND THELNETHAM IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK AND THE PARISHES OF SOUTH LOPHAM AND BLO' NORTON IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thelnetham Windmill
Mill Road
Thelnetham
DISS
IP22 1JS
- Phone:
- 07772769025
- Email:
- enquiries@lohp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window