EVESHAM MS THERAPY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 03 October 2003: Standard registration
- 02 May 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 26 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 04 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, GUIDANCE, COUNSELLING, THERAPIES AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE SERVICES AND TREATMENTS AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A CENTRE AT WHICH THE OBJECTS CAN BE CARRIED OUT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE IN GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND WORCESTERSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window